Financial history FAWBERT AND BARNARD'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 310965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £9.14k £9.83k £10.81k £11.40k £12.07k
Total expenditure £11.57k £8.69k £10.90k £12.33k £11.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A