FAWBERT AND BARNARD'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bursary applications are invited from individuals between the ages of 16-25 who either live/have lived or attend/have attended a school within a 3-mile radius of Gt.St.Mary's Church, Sawbridgeworth
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 28 September 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Treby | Trustee | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Crosby | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Buckmaster | Trustee | 25 May 2018 |
|
|||||
ERIC BUCKMASTER | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Paul Wilson | Trustee | 11 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA SUSAN IRENE RIDER | Trustee | 10 October 1990 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.57k | £9.14k | £9.83k | £10.81k | £11.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.55k | £11.57k | £8.69k | £10.90k | £12.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 31ST JANUARY 1907; SCHEME DATED 9TH OCTOBER 1950 AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 14TH AUGUST 1967.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS, OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY. TO AWARD SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER PLACE OF LEARNING TO PERSONS OF EITHER SEX WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS AND ARE RESIDENT WITHIN A RADIUS OF THREE MILES OF GREAT ST. MARY'S PARISH CHURCH, SAWBRIDGEWORTH OR HAVE FOR NOT LESS THAN THREE YEARS AT ANY TIME ATTENDED A SCHOOL IN THE URBAN DISTRICK OF SAWBRIDGE AND WHO IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF SAWBRIDGEWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 West Road
SAWBRIDGEWORTH
Hertfordshire
CM21 0BN
- Phone:
- 01279724670
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window