THE SALUSBURY AND BURROUGHS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to Church of England Schools in Offley and Cockernhoe. Gives financial assistance to persons of either sex, who are resident in Offley and who have not attained the age of 25 years; for outfits, clothing, tools, instruments or books in order to prepare for, or to enter, a profession, trade or calling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 10 August 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Louise Noden | Chair | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Jane Smith | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Alvarez | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Harris | Trustee | 29 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR WILL DYER | Trustee | 07 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROGER BRIAN PIEPENSTOCK | Trustee | 03 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALISTAIR DAVID MILLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev TERRANCE JAMES BELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.68k | £2.92k | £13.37k | £19.04k | £18.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.24k | £7.10k | £73.11k | £12.33k | £14.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 3 JULY 1964 AMENDED BY ORDER OF 18 APRIL 2006 AND RESOLUTION OF 3 OCTOBER 2006.
Charitable objects
(A) FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TOWARDS THE COST OF ALTERATIONS OF, AND REPAIRS TO, THE SCHOOLS OF THE FOUNDATION. (B) THE APPLICATION OF SUCH YEARLY SUMS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT IN PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY. (C) THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE FOR HIGHER, EDUCATION BY MEANS OF EXHIBITIONS TENABLE AT ANY PLACE OF HIGHER EDUCATION OR FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL OR TECHNICAL EDUCATION OR FINANCIAL HELP TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO PREPARE FOR , OR THE ENTER, A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING.(D) OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 West Lane
Great Offley
Hitchin
Hertfordshire
SG5 3AJ
- Phone:
- 01462768725
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window