HOCKERILL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 311018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promotion of education and training by making grants to defined categories of individuals in higher and further education, with a priority to teacher training and to Religious Education; grants to organisations for research of development of Religious Education; grants to the church's educational work, particularly in the Dioceses of Chelmsford and St Albans.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £365,000
Total expenditure: £382,325

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 January 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HOCKERILL COLLEGE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Archdeacon Janet Mackenzie Chair 31 December 2018
THE ST ALBANS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
CHARITY OF MAY BRUCE ROBINSON FOR THE REPAIR AND UPKEEP OF THE CHURCH OF ST GILES, SOUTH MIMMS
Received: On time
THE HOCKERILL EDUCATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time
NEW BARNET PAROCHIAL SCHOOLS TRUST
Received: On time
SHARED CHURCHES (HERTFORDSHIRE AND BEDFORDSHIRE) LIMITED
Received: On time
Ruth Elizabeth Everett Trustee 28 August 2024
THE HOCKERILL EDUCATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time
Rt Rev Roger Anthony Brett Morris Trustee 28 August 2024
THE HOCKERILL EDUCATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time
THE CHELMSFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
INNERVATION TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Timothy Adam Rouse Trustee 28 August 2024
THE HOCKERILL EDUCATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time
The Venerable Jonathan Edward Croucher Trustee 28 August 2024
None on record
Carrie Prior Trustee 18 May 2023
THE HOCKERILL EDUCATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time
Rt Rev Dr Gulnar Eleanor Francis-Dehqani Trustee 30 November 2022
THE CHARITY FOR LICENSED MINISTERS IN THE DIOCESE OF CHELMSFORD
Received: On time
THE HOCKERILL EDUCATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time
David Roy Lodge Trustee 30 November 2022
THE HOCKERILL EDUCATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time
Judy Ann King Trustee 30 November 2021
THE HOCKERILL EDUCATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time
Anthea Jane Kenna Trustee 13 May 2015
KESWICK HALL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE HOCKERILL EDUCATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time
NATIONAL GOVERNANCE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
COLIN GRAHAM BIRD Trustee
ROGER DANIEL FOR SERMON AND POOR
Received: On time
THE MARA RIANDA CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS WITH ST JOHN, HERTFORD
Received: On time
THE HOCKERILL EDUCATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time
ROGER DANIEL (FOR POOR PRISONERS)
Received: On time
ALL SAINTS CHURCH FUNDS FOR ORGANIST
Received: On time
SIR JOHN HARRISON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE OVERSEAS BISHOPRICS' FUND
Received: On time
JANET ROSEMARY SCOTT Trustee
THE HOCKERILL EDUCATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time
RT REVD DR ALAN GREGORY CLAYTON SMITH BA MA PHD Trustee
St Etheldreda’s Bedford Trust
Received: On time
THE ST ALBANS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE HOCKERILL EDUCATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £354.65k £321.50k £329.04k £356.16k £365.00k
Total expenditure £359.22k £369.03k £332.61k £331.70k £382.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 14 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 Swallows
Harlow
CM17 0AR
Phone:
01279420855