RICHARD THOMPSON GUNTON MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Onslow St Audrey's School with benefits not provided by the LA. Providing prizes to pupils who have shown outstanding public spirit. Promoting the education of prospective, present or past pupils of the school who are in need of financial assistance. Making grants to Hatfield charities educating or enhancing through leisure time activities the lives of persons under the age of 25 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 16 June 1965: Standard registration
- THE GUNTON TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN ELLIS-HALL | Chair | 11 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kathryn Jane Alford | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Nicola Jane Simson | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Sarah Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Darren Victor Collins | Trustee | 27 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.73k | £4.01k | £4.18k | £4.18k | £4.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.62k | £12.87k | £1.62k | £8.15k | £9.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF THE 26TH JANUARY 1976 AND 16TH SEPTEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY A YEARLY SUM OF NOT MORE THAN $40 OR SUCH OTHER SUM AS THE COMMISSIONERS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME APPROVE IN PROVIDING PRIZES TO BE AWARDED TO PUPILS ATTENDING ONSLOW ST AUDREY'S COUNTY SECONDARY SCHOOL WHO HAVE SHOWN OUTSTANDING PUBLIC SPRITI. OTHERWISE, INCOME TO BE APPLIED: IN OR TOWARDS PROVIDING FOR ST AUDREY'S SCHOOL SPECIAL BENEFITS NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY. IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE ABOUT TO ATTEND OR ARE ATTENDING OR HAVE FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS ATTENDED ST AUDREY'S SCHOOL AND ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 17 OF SCHEME).
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HATFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
ONSLOW ST. AUDREYS SCHOOL
OLD RECTORY DRIVE
HATFIELD
AL10 8AB
- Phone:
- 01707264228
- Email:
- admin@onslow.herts.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window