Financial history LOCKERS PARK SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 311061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.94m £2.47m £2.88m £3.56m £4.56m
Total expenditure £2.79m £2.67m £2.96m £3.35m £3.97m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £251.11k £60.67k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £76.00k £1.61k £2.74k £60.18k £138.17k
Income - Other trading activities £3.48k £0 £19.49k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.61m £2.39m £2.86m £3.44m £4.33m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £33 £0 £250 £20.08k £70.11k
Income - Other £251.11k £75.17k £0 £37.07k £26.14k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.70m £2.59m £2.86m £3.24m £3.88m
Expenditure - Raising funds £82.66k £77.41k £95.02k £118.23k £93.01k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £23.10k £17.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0