Trustees CHARLOTTE HOUSE SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 311075
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Peterson Trustee 08 November 2024
None on record
Zainab Odutola Trustee 02 July 2024
None on record
Sarah Hollis Trustee 02 July 2024
None on record
Simon William Leigh Reader Trustee 12 July 2022
None on record
Caroline Smethers Trustee 01 March 2022
None on record
Shreya Ramroop Trustee 02 November 2020
None on record
Robert John Stuttaford Trustee 09 June 2020
None on record
Diana Margaret Phillipa Wilson Trustee 27 June 2013
None on record
ADAM GEORGE HATFIELD ACA Trustee
None on record
PAUL MCGLONE Trustee
None on record