Financial history CHARITY OF SIR JOSEPH WILLIAMSON FOR APPRENTICING

Charity number: 311108
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £795 £811 £827 £849 £4.35k
Total expenditure £500 £0 £1.00k £0 £5.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A