DICKLEBURGH SCHOOL

Charity Number: 311139
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2004

Total income: £2,410
Total expenditure: £120

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 May 1963: Standard registration
  • 02 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • FRIENDS OF DICKLEBURGH SCHOOL (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2004
Total gross income £2.41k
Total expenditure £120
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2004 23 November 2005 291 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2004 Not Required