Accounts and annual returns JOHN WRIGHT'S ENDOWED SCHOOL

Charity number: 311145
Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 May 2021 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required