JOHN WRIGHT'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational through the award of small grants and awards to primary school age children and students resident in Stanhoe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Norfolk
Governance
- 28 December 1962: Standard registration
- WRIGHTS CHARITY (Working name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diana Jennifer Lord | Trustee | 15 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Margaret Elizabeth Coates | Trustee | 13 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter Ralph Cook | Trustee | 13 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Lindsey William Moscrop | Trustee | 13 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELSPETH JEAN ADAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £303 | £300 | £304 | £337 | £361 | |
|
Total expenditure | £300 | £308 | £308 | £208 | £2.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 6TH APRIL 1802
Charitable objects
PUTTING TO SCHOOL AND EDUCATING IN A SUITABLE MANNER ALL SUCH POOR CHILDREN BELONGING TO AND LIVING IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STANHOE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pightle Cottage
Docking Road
Stanhoe
KING'S LYNN
Norfolk
PE31 8QQ
- Phone:
- 01485 518409
- Email:
- parkthuburn@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window