Linked charities HORSHAM ST, FAITH NATIONAL SCHOOL
Charity number: 311162
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 17 NOVEMBER 1871 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 5 MARCH 1902 AND 27 MAY 1909.
Charitable objects
1 NATIONAL AND SUNDAY SCHOOL FUND FOR MAINTENANCE AND SUPPORT OF HORSHAM ST FAITHS NATIONAL SCHOOL AND THE PROVISION OF RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHURCH OF ENGLAND BY MEANS OF SUNDAY SCHOOL IN EACH PARISH. 2 FURTHER EDUCATION FUND APPLIED BY THE AWARD OF PAYMENTS AND MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES SUBJECT TO CONDITIONS SET OUT.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF HORSFORD AND HORSHAM ST. FAITH.
Registration history
- 10 September 1963 : Standard registration
- 24 May 2001 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.