NECTON CHURCH AND SCHOOL ESTATE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of items services and facilites of an educational nature and the promotion of education of persons under the age of 25 in the Parish of Necton All Saints in the County of Norfolk and the furtherence of religious work of the Church of England in the said Parish by maitaining the fabric of the Parish Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 16 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
Governance
- 01 July 1963: Standard registration
- TOWN LANDS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVD STEPHEN LINTON THORP | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Vicki Long | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carole Elizabeth Mary Hicks | Trustee | 10 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christine Jane Barley | Trustee | 04 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Faccenda-Tait | Trustee | 04 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEBORAH SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 16/03/2020 | 16/03/2021 | 16/03/2022 | 16/03/2023 | 16/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.61k | £3.61k | £4.49k | £544.38k | £35.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.07k | £8.80k | £4.05k | £8.75k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.46k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £538.92k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.75k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 16 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 16 March 2023 | 18 September 2024 | 246 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 March 2023 | 18 September 2024 | 246 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 16 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 March 2021 | 06 November 2022 | 294 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 7TH JUNE 1855 AS AFFECTED BY ORDERS OF 23 JULY 1856 AND 11 MAY 1906 SCHEME DATED 17 MARCH 2004 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 28 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE (1) THE PROVISION OF ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR THE SCHOOL. (2) THE PROMOTION OF THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (3) THE FURTHERANCE OF RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY MAINTAINING THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NECTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Rectory
School Road
Necton
Swaffham
Norfolk
PE37 8HT
- Phone:
- 01760722021
- Email:
- slthorp@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window