THE PASTON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist the Paston College and its students in any way deemed appropriate by the trustees. Currently regular expenditure is:- Insurance premium for a collection of Horatio Nelson memorabilia (a student at Paston) - Annual grants to students nominated by the college - From 2008 bursary grants to students outside catchment area to assist travelling.General financial support to the college.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 12 July 1966: Standard registration
- THE PASTON COLLEGE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- THE PASTON GRAMMAR SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Stibbons | Chair | 16 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Horner-Glister | Trustee | 22 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Dennison | Trustee | 22 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Rev Nigel John Merrick Paterson | Trustee | 08 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Baker | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.46k | £14.79k | £15.18k | £18.18k | £22.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.09k | £36.19k | £10.76k | £2.24k | £10.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 12 FEBRUARY 2001. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15 NOV 2017 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20 JUL 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO PROMOTE EDUCATION IN NORTH EAST NORFOLK OF PERSONS AGED 11-19 YEARS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS.
Area of benefit
NORTH EAST NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
WHITE HORSES
THE WARREN
CROMER
NR27 0AR
- Phone:
- 01263515453
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window