THORPE HOUSE SCHOOL (NORWICH) EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust's objects are to create, acquire, establish and maintain Thorpe House School for the education of girls.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 15 August 1963: Standard registration
- 11 October 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THORPE HOUSE SCHOOL (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2013 | 31/10/2014 | 31/10/2015 | 31/10/2016 | 31/10/2017 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2017 | 19 September 2018 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2016 | 20 October 2017 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2015 | 17 May 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2015 | 29 December 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2014 | 08 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 26TH APRIL 1963 AS AMEDEND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO CREATE, ACQUIRE, ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN THORPE HOUSE SCHOOL, NORWICH OR OTHER SCHOOLS FOR THE EDUCATION OF GIRLS AND, IF THOUGHT FIT, FOR BOYS AND TO SUPPLY THE PUPILS WITH HIGH STANDARDS OF EDUCATION TO INCLUDE PHYSICAL, MORAL AND RELIGIOUS TRAINING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window