Financial history THE GERTRUDE OFFORD MEMORIAL FUND IN CONNECTION WITH THE NORWICH SCHOOL OF ART

Charity number: 311285
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13 £15 £16 £16 £16
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A