BURWELL EDUCATION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 311330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides grants for educational purposes for residents of Burwell, Cambridgeshire. Grants are paid from land rental monies.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £4,759
Total expenditure: £7,780

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 November 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BURWELL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev ELEANOR JANE WILLIAMS Chair 20 June 2011
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN BURWELL WITH ST ETHELDREDA AND THE HOLY TRINITY REACH
Received: On time
ST MARY'S BURWELL PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
THE CHARLES WILLIAM HUNT COAL FUND
Received: On time
CHURCH LANDS
Received: On time
THE GUILD OF HEALTH AND ST RAPHAEL
Received: On time
Dr Stephen Charles Martin Trustee 21 June 2021
ST MARY'S BURWELL PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
CHURCH LANDS
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN BURWELL WITH ST ETHELDREDA AND THE HOLY TRINITY REACH
Received: On time
Jeremy Lander Trustee 21 June 2021
CHURCH LANDS
Received: On time
JACQUELINE MAY LUCAS Trustee 07 December 2015
CHURCH LANDS
Received: On time
MARY HELEN HAMMOND Trustee 13 December 2011
BURWELL COMMUNITY PRINT CENTRE LIMITED
Received: On time
CHURCH LANDS
Received: On time
KENNETH WILFRED HURRELL Trustee 05 December 2005
CHURCH LANDS
Received: On time
SIMON NEIL OGILVIE Trustee 22 March 1999
CHURCH LANDS
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN BURWELL WITH ST ETHELDREDA AND THE HOLY TRINITY REACH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £4.69k £4.73k £5.06k £6.68k £4.76k
Total expenditure £3.76k £6.28k £3.54k £7.44k £7.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 12 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 06 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
72 NEWMARKET ROAD
BURWELL
CAMBRIDGE
CB25 0AE
Phone:
01638 743556
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available