THE ROGERS EXHIBITION OR SCHOLARSHIP FOUNDATION

Charity number: 311373
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

to provide financial assistance for residents of Cottenham, Cambs wishing to enter further or higher education or take up an apprenticeship

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022

Total income: £107
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 August 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CATHERINE PEPYS & ROGERS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LISA DAWN NICOLL Trustee 21 October 2013
ALICE ROGERS FOR APPRENTICING
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
JANE BRIGHAM
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
THE CATHERINE PEPYS FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
MELVYN ROBERT ABRAHAM Trustee
THE CATHERINE PEPYS FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
JANE BRIGHAM
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
MR BOB ABRAHAM Trustee
ALICE ROGERS FOR APPRENTICING
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
THE CATHERINE PEPYS FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
JANE BRIGHAM
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
JOHNATHAN JAMES FISON GRAVES Trustee
THE CATHERINE PEPYS FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
RICHARD FISON GRAVES Trustee
ALICE ROGERS FOR APPRENTICING
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
THE CATHERINE PEPYS FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
JANE BRIGHAM
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
NICOLA PLEDGER Trustee
THE CATHERINE PEPYS FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
JANE BRIGHAM
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
SUSAN ELIZABETH WALKER Trustee
THE CATHERINE PEPYS FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
ALICE ROGERS FOR APPRENTICING
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
JANE BRIGHAM
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
COLIN BENJAMIN FREDERICK WATSON Trustee
THE CATHERINE PEPYS FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
ALICE ROGERS FOR APPRENTICING
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
JANE BRIGHAM
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £98 £104 £102 £104 £107
Total expenditure £0 £300 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 March 2022 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 Rooks Street
Cottenham
Cambridge
CB24 8QZ
Phone:
01954200862
Website:

No information available