Accounts and annual returns PERSE SCHOOL ENDOWMENT

Charity number: 311434
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2007 19 June 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 19 June 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2006 21 June 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 21 June 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2005 27 June 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 05 December 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2004 05 July 2005 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 20 December 2004 On Time