Financial history ARNOLFINI GALLERY CIO

Charity number: 311504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.44m £1.27m £1.44m £1.55m £1.53m
Total expenditure £1.23m £841.80k £1.31m £1.55m £1.58m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £953.61k £909.28k £730.65k £725.01k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.31m £1.02m £813.52k £898.51k £858.60k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £160.12k £432.63k £441.73k £407.44k
Income - Charitable activities £23.99k £17.06k £68.57k £115.11k £133.98k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £105.67k £77.18k £71.94k £87.93k £107.60k
Income - Other £0 £0 £57.23k £9.32k £2.61k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.21m £699.81k £1.02m £1.27m £1.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £21.15k £141.99k £290.17k £280.64k £270.50k
Expenditure - Governance £59.16k £37.25k £29.48k £29.31k £121.49k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £21.15k £19.05k £19.93k £18.72k £19.31k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0