DOYNTON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing small grants to support the education of young people resident in the parish of Doynton.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 27 June 1962: Standard registration
- LANGTON CHARITY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM HENRY CREW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PETER GRAHAM EDWARD RUBERY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR RALPH EDWARD MIDWINTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM IVOR JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £134 | £116 | £118 | £114 | £121 | |
|
Total expenditure | £200 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 197 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 197 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 563 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 563 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 928 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 928 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1293 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1293 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1658 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1658 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 12 MAY 1932
Charitable objects
(A) ASSISTING BOYS AND GIRLS IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ATTEND SCHOOLS OF HIGHER EDUCATION. (B) IN ARRANGING WITH THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR THEIR PHYSICAL WELL-BEING AND (C) IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS OF THE POORER CLASSES OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF DOYNTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. IVES FARM
WATERY LANE
DOYNTON
BRISTOL
BS30 5TA
- Phone:
- 01179372888
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window