ELIZABETH HODGES'S GLOUCESTERSHIRE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The income of the Foundation is used in promoting education to persons under the age of 25 who live in the Gloucestershire parishes of Long Newnton, Shipton Moyne, Ashley, Westonbirt with Lasborough, Didmarton and Tetbury Upton. Income from the Wiltshire fund is used for children in need of financial assistance in the parishes of Brokenborough, Easton Grey and Sherston.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Gloucestershire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 20 June 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLINE BAKER | Chair |
|
||||||
Nicola Powell | Trustee | 24 February 2015 |
|
|||||
Robert Colin Tallon | Trustee | 19 February 2013 |
|
|||||
JILL PEACEY | Trustee | 05 September 2011 |
|
|||||
MARK ANDREW WALLINGTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANNE WALSH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.83k | £3.95k | £4.31k | £5.04k | £4.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.46k | £3.20k | £3.19k | £3.46k | £3.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 10 JUNE 1937 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME SEALED 3 OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOL. PAYMENT OF ú5 FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE SHIPTON MOYNE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL, AND THE REMAINDER OF INCOME TO BE APPLIED IN SHARES OF ONE-THIRD EACH TO THE PARISHES OF SHIPTON MOYNE, WESTON BIRT, LONG NEWTON, BROKENBOROUGH, EASTON GREY, AND SHERSTON MAGNA, FOR ASSISTING CHILDREN TO ATTEND SCHOOLS, CLASSES OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS, BY PAYMENT OF FEES, TRAVELLING OR OTHER EXPENSES, OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES. OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF POORER BOYS AND GIRLS IN THE SAID PARISHES.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLLY COTTAGE
THE STREET
DIDMARTON
BADMINTON
AVON
GL9 1DS
- Phone:
- 01454238235
- Email:
- helen@financedept.biz
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window