HOPTON SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hopton Trust was originally founded by Frances Hopton in early 1700 to provide education for needy children in Cam. Today the Trust own and maintain the original Schoolhouse which is used as a Childcare setting, providing: breakfast, out of school and holiday clubs, as well as a playgroup.The Trust provide funds for Cam Hopton School leavers bibles and mugs and for set projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 11 October 1962: Standard registration
- HOPTON SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tim Yudin | Chair | 05 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mona Aldridge | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Fiona Crocker | Trustee | 17 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Toffi | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Chris Tomkins | Trustee | 03 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.71k | £12.26k | £15.37k | £15.46k | £16.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.33k | £14.41k | £14.04k | £14.48k | £13.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 18 JUNE 1993 AS ALTERED BY FURTHER SCHEME DATED 5 OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO MAKE PAYMENTS TO THE GOVERNORS OF THE SCHOOL FOR THE PURPOSE OF MAINTAINING THE SCHOOL, TO PROVIDE SPECIAL BENEFITS NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY AND IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 21 WHO ARE PUPILS OR FORMER PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL OR OF ANY CHURCH OF ENGLAND VOLUNTARY SCHOOL IN THE PARISH OF CAM OR THE ADJOINING PARISHES AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE - SEE CLAUSE 27 OF SCHEME FOR FULL DETAILS
Area of benefit
THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF CAM AND THE ADJOINING PARISHES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Green Street Farm
Green Street
Cam
Dursley
GL11 5HW
- Phone:
- 01453350163
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.