HIGGS AND COOPER'S EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides grants to young people who live in or were born in Charlton Kings and are under the age of 25. These grants are made for educational purposes - e.g. funding towards National Curriculum history trips, music lessons, activities associated with Guiding and Scouting (such as international gatherings), support for university or college education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 13 February 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIAN RICHARD COLE WOOLLEY | Trustee | 14 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Anna Macfadzean | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Connor | Trustee | 29 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Angie Boyes | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Gregory Pigott | Trustee | 05 December 2020 |
|
|||||
PETER JOHN AYLOTT | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|||||
AIDAN ROSE | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Matt Babbage | Trustee | 17 September 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.18k | £17.34k | £17.23k | £21.75k | £24.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.18k | £13.55k | £7.73k | £30.25k | £19.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 13 FEBRUARY 1976
Charitable objects
NOT MORE THAN ONE QUARTER OF THE INCOME MAY BE PAID TO THE MANAGERS OF ANY PRIMARY SCHOOL BEING A VOLUNTARY AIDED SCHOOL-ATTENDED BY PUPILS FROM THE AREA FO BENEFIT.-FOR APPLICATION TOWARDS REPAIRS TO THOSE SCHOOLS. FURTHER INCOME, AGAIN NO MORE THAN ONE QUARTER CAN BE USED IN PROVDING SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOR NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR ANY MAINTAINED PRIMARY OR SECONDARY SCHOOL. INCOME MAY ALSO BE APPLIED IN AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, ALLOWANCES, GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SECONDARY SCHOOL, COLLEGE OF EDUCATION OR UNIVERSITY AND PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ALLOW BENEFICIARIES TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION OR ENTER A PROFESSION
Area of benefit
FORMER PARISH OF CHARLTON KING'S
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Beeches Road
Charlton Kings
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL53 8NL
- Phone:
- 07887756855
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window