THE BELL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Creating opportunity, changing lives and overcoming disadvantage through language education. We work with partners on innovation, research, training and practical interventions. By generating and applying evidence, we aim to change practice, policy and systems for children, adults and communities in the UK disadvantaged through language.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£15,031,320
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £86.51k | |
Other trading activities | £14.20m | |
Investments | £744.41k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£15,074,076
Raising funds | £13.51m | |
Charitable activities | £1.57m | |
Other | £0 |
£2,286,991 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £13.51m | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.57m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £13.51m | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.57m | |
Retained for future use | £2.24m |
People

189 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 5 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 March 1973: Standard registration
- BELL INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Radha Rupa Chakraborty | Chair | 01 August 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Sarah Louise Phillips | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Camila Eve Reed | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Nicholas John Tesseyman | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Laura Reed | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Peter Donald Roscrow | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Daria Kuznetsova | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVID HUGHES | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|||||||||
ALEXANDER JOHN SCOTT-BARRETT | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Toni Fazaeli | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Elizabeth Jan King | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Reshard Auladin OBE | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.64m | £6.87m | £5.71m | £10.08m | £15.03m | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.72m | £9.23m | £8.30m | £11.08m | £15.07m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £2.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £14.73m | £5.60m | £4.90m | £9.55m | £14.20m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £160.00k | £78.00k | £42.29k | £60.83k | £86.51k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £745.00k | £497.00k | £417.04k | £472.07k | £744.41k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £687.00k | £347.59k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £938.00k | £1.30m | £1.75m | £1.62m | £1.57m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £13.78m | £7.93m | £6.55m | £9.46m | £13.51m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £145.00k | £257.00k | £322.10k | £194.24k | £181.96k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £60.00k | £263.00k | £468.40k | £387.38k | £117.06k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £107.00k | £107.00k | £126.31k | £121.52k | £138.43k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £11.46m | £11.64m | £11.35m | £11.21m | £11.26m | |
|
Long-term investments | £22.71m | £23.54m | £26.94m | £23.56m | £25.79m | |
|
Other assets | £16.04m | £11.90m | £9.84m | £10.73m | £10.34m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £6.27m | £4.31m | £4.28m | £5.69m | £5.37m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04/11/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ANY MEANS THAT THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION)BY: (A) THE CARRYING OUT AND DISSEMINATION OF RESEARCH INTO THE TEACHING AND LEARNING OF LANGUAGES AND THE USE OF LANGUAGE IN EDUCATION MORE GENERALLY (B)THE TRAINING AND PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT OF LANGUAGE TEACHERS (C)THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ORGANISITIONS AND INDIVIDUALS TO FURTHER LANGUAGE EDUCATION; AND (SAVE FOR PURPOSES INCIDENTAL AND ANCILLARY TO THESE OBJECTS) NO OTHER PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Bell Educational Trust Ltd
Red Cross Lane
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 0QU
- Phone:
- 01223275588
- Email:
- info@bell-foundation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window