THE LECHLADE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports C of E primary School, childrens' activities in Church. Grant to students receiving further ecucation under the age of 25yrs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 13 November 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV ANDREW CINNAMOND | Chair | 21 November 2011 |
|
|||||||
Mary Williams | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|||||||
Catherine Hitchman | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
SUSAN HOLMES | Trustee |
|
||||||||
ARTHUR CHASE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
KATHRYN NEWTON | Trustee |
|
||||||||
BARBARA PEARE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.88k | £5.28k | £4.03k | £5.28k | £4.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.13k | £4.73k | £1.73k | £5.09k | £5.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 February 2024 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 1ST JULY 1975
Charitable objects
1. A YEARLY SUM OF ú3 TO BE PAID TO THE VICAR FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH FO ST LAWRENCE LECHLADE FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROMOTING RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND BY MEANS OF A SUNDAY SCHOOL. 2. TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE TO THE MANAGERS OR GOVERNORS OF ANY SCHOOL IN THE PARISH OF LECHLADE BEING A VOLUNTARY SCHOOL WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE EDUCATION ACTS. 1944 TO 1973 IN DISCHARGING THEIR OBLIGATIONS WITH RESPECT OT THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SCHOOL.3) FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF YOUNG PERSONS WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO, OR WHOSE PARENTS OR ONE OR OTHER OF THEM ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF LECHLADE IN THE COUNTY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND WHO, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES, ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 5 OF SCHEME).
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LECHLADE
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRIDGE COTTAGE
DOWNINGTON
LECHLADE
GL7 3DL
- Phone:
- 01367252437
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window