ROMNEY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist the young people of Tetbury in the furtherance of their educational and vocational careers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 13 December 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.96k | £2.00k | £2.04k | £2.11k | £2.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.91k | £1.67k | £680 | £2.99k | £2.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 29TH SEPTEMBER 1922 AS VARIED BY A SCHEME DATED 12TH SEPTEMBER 1966 AND BY RESOLUTIONS 19 MAY 2006 AND 22 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, WHO ARE EITHER ATTENDING SCHOOLS IN TETBURY, OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS SERVING THAT AREA, OR WHO ARE ALSO RESIDENT WITHIN THE PARISHES OR DISTRICTS OF TETBURY AND TETBURY UPTON, BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH FINANCIAL OR MATERIAL ASSISTANCE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, (INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION BY THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE IN ACCESSING VOCATIONAL TRAINING).
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
LANCE VICK
CRICKETERS REST
14 NORTHFIELD ROAD
TETBURY
GL8 8HB
- Phone:
- 01666504331
- Email:
- ajmckay@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window