POWELL'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 311701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide financial assistance to the School of the Foundation, Powell's School, and also Deer Park and Kingshill Schools. The Charity may also provide financial assistance to promote the education (including social and physical training) of persons under the age of 25 years who are either pupils or former pupils of the aforesaid Schools or who are resident in Cirencester.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £75,351
Total expenditure: £67,688

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 March 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CARYN LESLEY PUTNEY Chair 04 October 2013
SIR THOMAS ROWE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN EDMONDS CHARITY
Received: On time
Edward Allen Harry Ernest Jamieson CEng FEI Trustee 12 May 2023
JOHN EDMONDS CHARITY
Received: On time
SIR THOMAS ROWE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Sarah Helen Watson Trustee 01 May 2019
SIR THOMAS ROWE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN EDMONDS CHARITY
Received: On time
Claire Minett Trustee 01 November 2018
JOHN EDMONDS CHARITY
Received: On time
SIR THOMAS ROWE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev'd Canon Graham Edwin Morris Trustee 12 October 2018
SMITH'S CIRENCESTER POOR CHARITY
Received: On time
THE CIRENCESTER VICAR AND CHURCHWARDENS’ CHARITY
Received: On time
THE CHRISTOPHER AND SARAH ALDAM BOWLY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN EDMONDS CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN JONES
Received: On time
CIRENCESTER UNITED ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
C D CRIPP'S CHARITY
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF CIRENCESTER PARISH CHURCH
Received: On time
CIRENCESTER STREET PASTORS
Received: On time
SIR THOMAS ROWE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Andrew James Perry Phillips BSc Trustee 04 October 2018
SIR THOMAS ROWE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN EDMONDS CHARITY
Received: On time
SARAH GARDINER Trustee 01 January 2016
SIR THOMAS ROWE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN EDMONDS CHARITY
Received: On time
ANDREW ROBERT JOHNSON Trustee 01 May 2014
CIRENCESTER HOUSING FOR YOUNG PEOPLE
Received: On time
SIR THOMAS ROWE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN EDMONDS CHARITY
Received: On time
CIRENCESTER HOUSING FOR YOUNG PEOPLE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £207.31k £206.64k £83.65k £117.25k £75.35k
Total expenditure £421.72k £142.06k £50.83k £74.88k £67.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 August 2022 205 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 August 2022 205 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 August 2022 570 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 August 2022 570 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 OCTOBER 1960
Charitable objects
ANNUAL PRIZE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 19 March 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
7 DOLLAR STREET
CIRENCESTER
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
GL7 2AS
Phone:
01285650000
Website:

No information available