BEAUDESERT PARK SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Beaudesert Park School provides a preparatory education to pupils of either sex aged between 3 and 13; children receive this education by attending the School as day pupils or as boarders, which is an option for the more senior pupils. The School also promotes education in all respects by sharing its facilities and resources with other local schools, charities, organisations and individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£7,874,209
Donations and legacies | £1.25k | |
Charitable activities | £7.64m | |
Other trading activities | £114.46k | |
Investments | £110.61k | |
Other | £3.04k |
Total expenditure:
£7,624,092
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £7.62m | |
Other | £0 |
£35,517 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.62m | |
Retained for future use | £250.12k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.62m | |
Retained for future use | £285.63k |
People

158 Employee(s)
17 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 03 December 1968: Standard registration
- BEAUDESERT PARK SCHOOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Jones | Chair | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zahra Lucas | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Elliott | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Walker | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Holloway | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Collins | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Christopher Casey | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charles Julian Thompson | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Massey | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carys Sian Block MBE | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP EVITT | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
HARRIET I'ANSON | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Nettleton | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Claire Kay | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lady Ros Ford | Trustee | 08 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christine Lough | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS DANIEL AHEARNE | Trustee | 29 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.62m | £6.58m | £6.98m | £7.72m | £7.87m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.62m | £6.38m | £6.91m | £7.30m | £7.62m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £264.84k | £162.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.16m | £72.83k | £3.50k | £8.36k | £1.25k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £43.28k | £4.11k | £77.58k | £87.99k | £114.46k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £6.12m | £6.32m | £6.89m | £7.57m | £7.64m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £9.90k | £1.36k | £6 | £39.56k | £110.61k | |
|
Income - Other | £280.60k | £184.17k | £7.81k | £17.80k | £3.04k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £71.50k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.62m | £6.38m | £6.91m | £7.30m | £7.62m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £27.33k | £21.84k | £25.33k | £25.80k | £28.58k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £8.76m | £8.50m | £8.46m | £8.19m | £7.97m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.29m | |
|
Other assets | £2.12m | £2.33m | £2.44m | £3.00m | £2.56m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.57m | £1.31m | £1.32m | £1.18m | £4.52m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 21ST AUGUST 1968, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 6 JUNE 2006. as amended on 17 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
(1) TO ACQUIRE AND CARRY ON IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ANY BOARDING OR DAY SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS OR ANY COMBINED BOARDING AND DAY SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OF EITHER SEX OF BOTH SEXES AND THE FURTHERING OF EDUCATION IN ALL ITS ASPECTS. (2) TO ACQUIRE CARRY ON AND DEVELOP THE UNDERTAKING OF BEAUDESERT PARK SCHOOL, MINCHINHAMPTON IN THE COUNTY OF GLOUCESTER, A PREPARATORY SCHOOL AND THE PREMISES UPON UPON WHICH SUCH UNDERTAKING IS CARRIED ON.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Beaudesert Park School Trust Ltd
Minchinhampton
Stroud
GL6 9AF
- Phone:
- 01453 832072
- Email:
- office@bps.school
- Website:
-
beaudesert.gloucs.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window