Financial history TOCKINGTON MANOR SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 311716
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £2.49m £2.77m £3.24m £3.80m £3.21m
Total expenditure £2.64m £2.84m £3.14m £3.77m £3.15m
Income from government contracts £12.38k £26.07k £26.33k £30.47k £31.40k
Income from government grants £68.61k £119.74k £110.22k £127.77k £69.18k
Income - Donations and legacies £8.99k £38.50k £9.36k £3.50k £19.12k
Income - Other trading activities £119.27k £87.15k £151.55k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.37m £2.64m £3.08m £3.61m £3.12m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £187.20k £65.73k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.62m £2.82m £3.11m £3.73m £3.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £22.16k £20.43k £26.38k £35.00k £35.23k
Expenditure - Governance £11.81k £0 £0 £11.50k £12.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0