Trustees Waldorf Learning Foundation Limited
Charity Number: 311719

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicolas James Hailey | Chair | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Marie Wilkinson | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Masengu Kalima-Phiri | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Maria Atkinson-Ryan | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bijal Majithia | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ismail Badat | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Virginia Isaac | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Donald Skelton | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Stephen Oswin McCullagh | Trustee | 19 May 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.