Financial history CHELTENHAM LADIES COLLEGE

Charity number: 311722
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £32.82m £31.04m £37.15m £39.72m £42.51m
Total expenditure £32.94m £31.57m £32.91m £37.25m £40.72m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.03m N/A £36.37k £36.37k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.53m £981.00k £1.73m £543.00k £423.00k
Income - Other trading activities £1.21m £610.00k £1.72m £2.33m £2.76m
Income - Charitable activities £29.80m £29.60m £33.35m £36.03m £38.00m
Income - Endowments £32.00k £0 £1.40m £0 £0
Income - Investment £288.00k £273.00k £353.00k £815.00k £1.32m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £1.19m £199.00k £52.00k £60.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £31.35m £30.24m £31.44m £35.45m £38.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.59m £1.33m £1.47m £1.81m £2.06m
Expenditure - Governance £144.00k £128.00k £121.00k £148.00k £149.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £8.00k £10.00k £21.00k £28.00k £39.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0