CHELTENHAM LADIES COLLEGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE A SOUND AND BROADLY BASED EDUCATION FOR GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN (AND ALSO, IF SO DETERMINED BY COUNCIL, BOYS AND YOUNG MEN) IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND TO AFFORD FACILITIES FOR STUDY AND RESEARCH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£42,505,000
Donations and legacies | £423.00k | |
Charitable activities | £38.00m | |
Other trading activities | £2.76m | |
Investments | £1.32m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£40,717,000
Raising funds | £2.06m | |
Charitable activities | £38.66m | |
Other | £0 |
£605,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £36,373 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.06m | |
Charitable expenditure | £38.66m | |
Retained for future use | £1.79m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.06m | |
Charitable expenditure | £38.66m | |
Retained for future use | £2.39m |
People

714 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
181 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 22 |
£70k to £80k | 7 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 4 |
£100k to £110k | 3 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 25 March 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cathryn Merryl Webster | Chair | 01 March 2019 |
|
|||||||
Lisa Jane Norcross | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Fahad Shahid Sayood | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Gordon Richard Guy Willoughby | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sally Carol Lancashire | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Cleo Yeung Sham | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jemima Jane Ashworth Edney | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Emma Pearson | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Sue Cattermole | Trustee | 26 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID MURDOCH FOTHERINGHAM | Trustee | 26 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Antoinette Mary Trevail Wilson | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Roger Michael Denny | Trustee | 23 February 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Jonathan Briant | Trustee | 23 February 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Sara Michele Putt | Trustee | 25 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.82m | £31.04m | £37.15m | £39.72m | £42.51m | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.94m | £31.57m | £32.91m | £37.25m | £40.72m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.03m | N/A | £36.37k | £36.37k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.53m | £981.00k | £1.73m | £543.00k | £423.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.21m | £610.00k | £1.72m | £2.33m | £2.76m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £29.80m | £29.60m | £33.35m | £36.03m | £38.00m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £32.00k | £0 | £1.40m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £288.00k | £273.00k | £353.00k | £815.00k | £1.32m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.19m | £199.00k | £52.00k | £60.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £31.35m | £30.24m | £31.44m | £35.45m | £38.66m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.59m | £1.33m | £1.47m | £1.81m | £2.06m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £144.00k | £128.00k | £121.00k | £148.00k | £149.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £8.00k | £10.00k | £21.00k | £28.00k | £39.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £61.13m | £58.41m | £56.51m | £57.86m | £56.81m | |
|
Long-term investments | £6.76m | £12.41m | £22.73m | £22.99m | £44.24m | |
|
Other assets | £15.70m | £16.09m | £14.15m | £4.37m | £3.21m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£94.00k | -£46.00k | -£29.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £21.28m | £23.77m | £26.35m | £15.83m | £32.49m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 20/03/1935 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 22/12/1955 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 26/06/1991 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 24/07/2002 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 08/10/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A SOUND AND BROADLY BASED EDUCATION FOR GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN (AND ALSO IF SO DETERMINED BY THE COUNCIL FOR BOYS AND YOUNG MEN) IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES; AND TO AFFORD FACILITIES FOR STUDY AND RESEARCH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- AUGER PRIZE FOR UPPER COLLEGE BIOLOGY
- CHELTENHAM LADIES' COLLEGE BURSARIES FUND
- CHELTENHAM LADIES' COLLEGE LEAVING EXHIBITIONS FUND
- CHELTENHAM LADIES' COLLEGE PRIZES FUND
- CHELTENHAM LADIES' COLLEGE SCHOLARSHIPS FUND
- KEIGHLEY PRIZE FOR NATURE PHOTOGRAPHY
- MARY LOUISE THOMPSON PRIZE FOR HISTORY
- THOMSON MEDICAL SCHOLARSHIP
- 25 March 1994 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cheltenham Ladies College
Bayshill Road
Cheltenham
GL50 3EP
- Phone:
- 01242 520691
- Email:
- chair@cheltladiescollege.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window