COTSWOLD CHINE HOME SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 12 September 1963: Standard registration
- 29 June 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 29 June 2006: Funds transferred to 1103955 NOVALIS TRUST
- COTSWOLD CHINE SCHOOL (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | 31/08/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.47m | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.81m | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | 22 April 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | 22 April 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31ST DECEMBER 1960
Charitable objects
A SCHOOL FOR THE EDUCATION OF MALADJUSTED CHILDREN IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND METHODS OF RUDOLF STEINER AND THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE REACHED THE SCHOOL LEAVING AGE AND HAVE SPECIAL LEARNING NEEDS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window