CHARITIES ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH THE COTHAM COUNTY SECONDARY SCHOOL FOR BOYS
Charity Number: 311728
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
- Bristol City
Governance
Registration history:
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Charitable objects
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
Linked charities
Governing document
REGULATIONS PASSED AT A MEETING HELD 17 JUNE 1942, AS AMENDED ON THE 14TH NOVEMBER 2005 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74(2)(A) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
AID OF PUPILS AT THE COTHAM COUNTY SECONDARY SCHOOL FOR BOYS TOWARDS EXPENSES CONNECTED WITH POST-CERTIFICATE EDUCATION WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE STUDYING SCIENCE OR MATHEMATICS FOR THE HIGHER SCHOOL CERTIFICATE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 21 June 1962 : Standard registration
- 21 March 2006 : Removed
- 21 March 2006 : Asset transfer out
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window