Trustees CLIFTON COLLEGE
Charity number: 311735

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Hugh Wadham Allen | Trustee | 22 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Karen Maguire | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Metcalfe | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Polding | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bowcott | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Higham | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ben Britz | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matt Black | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dom Jephcott | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Loveday Ryder | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Leonard | Trustee | 05 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Howard-Cairns | Trustee | 07 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Womersley | Trustee | 09 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alison Eynon | Trustee | 09 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Eldridge | Trustee | 09 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Glassberg | Trustee | 26 February 2016 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Tolchard | Trustee | 21 June 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.