TRINITY COLLEGE BRISTOL LIMITED

Charity number: 311793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide training in theological education to men and women for ordained and lay Christian ministry.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 November 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • TRINITY COLLEGE BRISTOL (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Esther Tamisa Prior Chair 10 June 2024
None on record
Rebecca Justine Chapman Trustee 21 October 2024
THE SOUTH LONDON CHURCH FUND AND SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE CHURCH AND MEDIA NETWORK
Received: On time
Rev Thomas Robert Morgan Trustee 10 June 2024
THE LIGHT CHURCH NETWORK
Received: On time
Rev Jon Scamman Trustee 24 January 2023
None on record
Rev Anjali Miriam Kanagaratnam Trustee 13 June 2022
ALMONDSBURY CHARITY
Received: On time
THE CARFAX TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Jeremy Michael Moodey Trustee 13 June 2022
CHURCH MISSION SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE SOUTH AMERICAN MISSION SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT CHESHAM
Received: On time
THE CARFAX TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Michael Duff Trustee 03 June 2019
None on record
Rev Simon Jonathan Potter Trustee 21 May 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE STOKE BISHOP
Received: On time
ROSEMARY HART MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
Rev HELEN FRASER Trustee 23 June 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £2.51m £2.51m £2.58m £2.58m £2.46m
Total expenditure £2.66m £2.52m £2.56m £2.71m £2.54m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £5.40k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £50.81k £75.19k £38.51k £104.76k £69.62k
Income - Other trading activities £353.19k £263.86k £273.48k £338.01k £399.06k
Income - Charitable activities £2.11m £2.15m £2.26m £2.14m £1.99m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £26 £25 £33 £26 £72
Income - Other £0 £15.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £65.49k £5.94k £56.86k £43.36k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.21m £2.14m £2.12m £2.43m £2.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds £14.52k £212.92k £274.29k £280.44k £307.98k
Expenditure - Governance £29.39k £29.61k £33.73k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £435.51k £166.60k £161.30k £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £14.28m £14.19m £14.08m £13.37m £13.30m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £1
Other assets £72.35k £83.64k £89.30k £112.59k £102.39k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£288.00k -£159.00k -£120.00k -£10.00k £0
Total liabilities £1.74m £1.66m £1.54m £1.13m £1.30m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 03 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 03 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 28 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 22 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 08 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 23 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 8 MARCH 1918 1 JULY 1924 AND 26 JANUARY 1976
Charitable objects
PAYMENTS OF GRANTS FOR RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION GIVEN BY CLERGYMEN OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AT INSTITUTIONS FOR TRAINING WOMEN FOR CHRISTIAN WORK AT HOME OR ABROAD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 30 November 1972 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
TRINITY COLLEGE
STOKE HILL
BRISTOL
BS9 1JP
Phone:
01179682803