OREM'S DENTON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assisting pupils to attend schools, institutions or classes for purposes of education in specified parishes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 14 December 1962: Standard registration
- 11 November 2008: Removed (Does not operate)
- 02 March 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Richard Harlow | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Joyce Wilson | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Burton | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marion Joan Hodson | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £305 | £289 | £275 | £362 | £489 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 9TH JUNE 1936
Charitable objects
(A) ASSISTING PUPILS TO ATTEND SCHOOLS, INSTITUTIONS OR CLASSES FOR PURPOSES OF EDUCATION OTHER THAN ELEMENTARY. (B) ATTENDING TO THE HEALTH OR PHYSICAL CONDITION OF CHILDREN ATTENDING ANY PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOL IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA. (C) OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, INCLIDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING, OF BOYS AND GIRLS OF THE POORER CLASSES IN THE SAID PARISH.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF DENTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ely Diocesan Offices
Etheldreda House
206 Lancaster Way Business Park
ELY
Cambridgeshire
CB6 3NX
- Phone:
- 01353652701
- Email:
- paul.evans@elydiocese.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window