LADY OLIVIA BERNARD SPARROW EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To aid a person under the age of 25 years who lives in Brampton and whose parents have lived there for over 5 years, who may need financial assistance to purchase outfits, tools,instruments, or books to help them on leaving school, university, or other educational establishment, to prepare for, or to enter, a profession, trade, or calling or who require assistance to enable them to follow a course
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 17 December 1968: Standard registration
- 09 September 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £162 | £162 | £162 | £162 | £662 | |
|
Total expenditure | £293 | £162 | £80 | £250 | £260 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 19 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 25 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 02 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 21 NOVEMBER 1968
Charitable objects
1) MAKING AN ANNUAL PAYMENT TO THE MANAGERS OF ANY CHURCH OF ENGLAND VOLUNTARY SCHOOL SERVING THE PARISH OF BRAMPTON, TOWARDS THE COST OF ALTERATIONS AND REPAIRS TO THE PREMISES OF THE SCHOOL.2) AWARDING TO PERSONS OF EITHER SEX RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF BRAMPTON, WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS, EXHIBITIONS OR GREANTS TENABLE AT ANY SECONDARY SCHOOL, TRAINING COLLEGE FOR TEACHERS, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER EDUCATION (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL).3) PROVIDING FINANCIAL OR OTHER ASSISTANCE TO HELP BENEFICIARIES ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT, TO PREPARE FOR, OR TO ENTER, A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING.4) OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BRAMPTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window