GARD'NER MEMORIAL LIMITED

Charity number: 311872
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The main activity of the company, which is a charitable company limited by guarantee, having no share capital, is to provide an education to meet the specific needs of all the boys admitted to the school, who have in common the fact that they would not thrive in mainstream schooling and who need additional help and support, especially in the areas of numeracy and literacy skills.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bracknell Forest
  • Hampshire
  • Kingston Upon Thames
  • Reading
  • Richmond Upon Thames
  • Slough
  • Surrey
  • West Berkshire
  • Windsor And Maidenhead
  • Wokingham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 July 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • MORE HOUSE SCHOOL (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Bell Trustee 14 November 2024
None on record
Jack Malden Trustee 20 June 2024
None on record
David Poole Trustee 20 June 2024
None on record
Dr Mounir Atassi Trustee 20 June 2024
None on record
Louise Skinner Trustee 20 June 2024
None on record
Paul Coby Trustee 01 May 2024
None on record
Charlotte Burnell Trustee 21 March 2024
None on record
Kyla De Sousa Trustee 05 February 2024
None on record
Alison Reynolds Trustee 15 June 2023
None on record
Andrew Routley Trustee 29 September 2022
None on record
Rev Nicholas Gosnell Trustee 09 June 2022
COUNCIL OF VOLUNTARY WELFARE WORK
Received: On time
Graham Spawforth Trustee 17 June 2021
None on record
GLENN VICTOR HANDLEY Trustee 20 July 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £8.36m £8.52m £8.97m £9.30m £9.74m
Total expenditure £7.78m £7.75m £8.19m £8.83m £9.56m
Income from government contracts £3.83m £4.46m £4.94m £5.46m £5.72m
Income from government grants N/A N/A £121.49k £52.67k £122.65k
Income - Donations and legacies £27.27k £13.99k £14.59k £15.96k £3.10k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £8.32m £8.49m £8.96m £9.28m £9.69m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10.50k £8.42k £408 £1.65k £16.80k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £31.01k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.67m £7.63m £8.08m £8.75m £9.42m
Expenditure - Raising funds £110.00k £116.20k £116.31k £83.80k £142.31k
Expenditure - Governance £11.05k £12.00k £18.21k £16.73k £30.07k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £13.60m £13.27m £13.27m £13.48m £13.32m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.60m £3.14m £3.59m £3.51m £4.29m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £2.75m £3.19m £2.86m £2.52m £2.95m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 14 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 14 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 21 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 07 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 23 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MORE HOUSE SCHOOL
MOONS HILL
FRENSHAM
FARNHAM
GU10 3AP
Phone:
01252792303