WALTON LEIGH SCHOOL PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Charity is to advance the education of the pupils at Walton Leigh School, a school for children with severe learning difficulties, by providing facilities and equipment which are not provided by the local education authority or the school and seeks to achieve this objective through encouraging the joint participation of the school's staff, parents, pupils and the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 13 April 1970: Standard registration
- WALTON LEIGH PSA (Working name)
- WALTON-LEIGH PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- WALTON-LEIGH PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION (WALTON-LEIGH SPECIAL TRAINING SCHOOL FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN) (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annabelle Mary Paget | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Elizabeth Shepherd | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Peter Bryant | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.16k | £12.11k | £150.30k | £95.80k | £52.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £795 | £27.34k | £126.43k | £137.30k | £65.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 December 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 December 2022 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 December 2022 | 411 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 December 2022 | 411 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 FEBRUARY 1970 AS AMENDED 16 JULY 1997 AND 20 APRIL 2009.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE STUDENTS OF WALTON LEIGH SPECIAL SCHOOL, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES. TO FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN PARENTS, STAFF AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL AND TO ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE STUDENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Walton Leigh School
Queens Road
Hersham
Walton-on-Thames
KT12 5AB
- Phone:
- 01932 223243
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window