MOORE'S EDUCATIONAL
Charity number: 311919
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant making with the parish of Worplesdon
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 September 2008
Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Surrey
Governance
Registration history:
- 26 June 1962: Standard registration
- 09 March 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/09/2004 | 06/09/2005 | 06/09/2006 | 06/09/2007 | 06/09/2008 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 September 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 06 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 06 September 2008 | 10 February 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 September 2007 | 23 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 September 2006 | 24 August 2007 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF DR. MOORE WHO DIED SEPTEMBER 1726
Charitable objects
TEACHING POOR CHILDREN OF THE PARISH TO READ, WRITE AND SEW, OR OTHERWISE EDUCATNG THEM.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PARISH OF WORPLESDON
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window