MARY STEPHENS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting and assisting with the education of persons under the age of 25 who are resident or their parents are resident in the Ancient Parish of Chipstead or who have attended the Chipstead County First School at Chipstead and who, in the opinion of the Governors, are in need of financial assiatnace.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Surrey
Governance
- 31 May 1966: Standard registration
- MARY STEPHENS CHARITY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DINAH MABBUTT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Susie Grover | Trustee | 09 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Esperon | Trustee | 05 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
SIMON HENRY KOLESAR FRICS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN MICHAEL STEPHENSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN PEARCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATY DERAGON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TIMOTHY HUMM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.93k | £8.08k | £8.24k | £8.41k | £8.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.85k | £8.00k | £8.43k | £4.88k | £6.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 16TH APRIL 1981 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 4TH DECEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
(1) TO PAY ALL THE PROPER COSTS, CHARGES AND EXPENSES OF AND INCIDENTAL TO THE ADMINISTRATION AND MANAGEMENT OF THE CHARITY. (2) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE OR BOTH OF WHOSE PARENTS ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF CHIPSTEAD OR WHO ARE ATTENDING OR HAVE ATTENDED THE CHIPSTEAD COUNTY FIRST SCHOOL AT CHIPSTEAD, OR ANY OTHER SCHOOL SITUATED IN THE SAID AREA BUT ARE RESIDENT OUTSIDE THE SAID AREA AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
THE ANCIENT PARISH OF CHIPSTEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
MORNINGTON
11b Holly Hill Drive
BANSTEAD
SM7 2BD
- Phone:
- 01737669663
- Email:
- john.stephenson24@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window