STRODE'S FOUNDATION

Charity number: 312026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Advance the education of students of the former Strode's Sixth Form College and young persons resident in the area of the former Urban District of Egham

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £103,079
Total expenditure: £149,593

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 October 1964: Standard registration
  • 13 February 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Vivian Murray Bairstow Chair 21 February 2019
THE EGHAM MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
COOPERS CHARITY CIO
Received: On time
THE EGHAM MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
CHARITY OF MARGARET PEIRSON FOR ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
Carl Jonathan Mann Trustee 20 June 2024
None on record
Roberta Ann Mock Trustee 10 October 2023
None on record
Stephen Ivor Hatherall Trustee 02 November 2021
None on record
VANESSA CRESSWELL Trustee 04 March 2020
None on record
Frank Curry Trustee 12 October 2017
None on record
NICHOLAS DERRICK JAMISON Trustee 02 January 2013
EGHAM AND THORPE ROYAL AGRICULTURAL AND HORTICULTURAL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Colin Ian Hill Cross FRICS Trustee
THE BRUNSWICK TOWN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE MRS A B ANDREWS COLLECTION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £68.79k £176.90k £71.57k £99.77k £103.08k
Total expenditure £53.74k £69.47k £45.62k £43.10k £149.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 22 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 AUGUST 1922
Charitable objects
1)PROVISION OF PRIZES FOR DIVINITY OR BIBLE HISTORY.2)TO ASSIST WITH SCHOOL FEES WHERE PARENTS ARE IN FINANCIAL DIFFICULTY AND TO PAY OR CONTRIBUTE TOWARDS TRAVELLING EXPENSES.3)TO PROVIDE BOOKS OF A SUITABLE CHARACTER FOR THE SCHOOL LIBRARY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 26 October 1964 : Standard registration
  • 13 February 2024 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
Horne Engall & Freeman
47A High Street
EGHAM
TW20 9ES
Phone:
01784432292
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available