VIRGINIA WATER PREPARATORY SCHOOL LIMITED
Charity Number: 312042
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 29 May 1963: Standard registration
- 17 February 2001: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- VIRGINIA WATER JUNIOR SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 15TH JUNE 1959 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 22ND JANUARY 1985, AND 19TH MARCH 1996
Charitable objects
TO ACQUIRE AND CARRY ON VIRGINIA WATER JUNIOR SCHOOL, AND TO ESTABLISH OR ACQUIRE AND CARRY ON OTHER SCHOOLS FOR BOYS AND/OR GIRLS IN CONNECTION WITH VIRGINIA WATER JUNIOR SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.