LITTLE BOOKHAM MANOR HOUSE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manor House School is a selective GSA independent day school for girls aged 2 - 16 years located in Little Bookham, Surrey. We deliver strong academic results alongside a provision of highly individualised learning and pastoral care in a smaller friendly school setting. Our supportive approach to teaching is renowned for building confidence and thereby achieving academic success for our pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£4,548,652
Donations and legacies | £26.17k | |
Charitable activities | £4.51m | |
Other trading activities | £13.33k | |
Investments | £3.09k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£4,581,109
Raising funds | £1.66k | |
Charitable activities | £4.58m | |
Other | £0 |
£3,092 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.66k | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.58m |
People

88 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 29 August 1962: Standard registration
- MANOR HOUSE SCHOOL (Working name)
- LITTLE BOOKHAM MANOR HOUSE SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS G SIMS-BRASSETT | Chair | 20 June 2014 |
|
|||||
Carys Dalton | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Ross | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Hayes | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Canon Paul Thompson | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ms M Kieran | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.37m | £4.06m | £4.07m | £4.34m | £4.55m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.36m | £4.15m | £4.12m | £4.18m | £4.58m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £158.93k | £40.95k | £26.28k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £5.49k | £1.80k | £31.72k | £929 | £26.17k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £9.33k | £23.14k | £9.04k | £34.32k | £13.33k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.35m | £4.03m | £3.83m | £4.07m | £4.51m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £26.17k | |
|
Income - Investment | £7.57k | £4.03k | £290 | £408 | £3.09k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £198.49k | £232.26k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.35m | £4.15m | £4.12m | £4.18m | £4.58m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.38k | £2.45k | £2.05k | £1.57k | £1.66k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £22.68k | £20.62k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.19m | £3.10m | £3.12m | £3.21m | £3.21m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.40m | £1.04m | £1.59m | £1.52m | £1.45m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £852.29k | £492.58k | £1.11m | £979.07k | £937.01k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/03/1962 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23/11/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, THE PROMOTION AND OPERATION OF MANOR HOUSE SCHOOL, LITTLE BOOKHAM, SURREY, OR ANY OTHER SCHOOLS, COLLEGES, NURSERIES, OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE EDUCATION OF GIRLS, AND, IF THOUGHT FIT, FOR THE EDUCATION OF BOYS, WHERE THEY MAY OBTAIN A GENERAL EDUCATION OF THE HIGHEST STANDARD, TOGETHER WITH PHYSICAL, MORAL AND RELIGIOUS TRAINING, SUCH RELIGIOUS TRAINING TO BE PROVIDED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SPIRIT AND ETHOS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND BUT CONSISTENT WITH OTHER CREEDS; ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH MANOR HOUSE SCHOOL, LITTLE BOOKHAM, SURREY, (OR ANY OTHER SCHOOL, COLLEGE, NURSERY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL FACILITY, AS PROVIDED FOR IN 3.1) THAT ARE APPROVED BY THE GOVERNORS IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION; AND PURPOSES INCIDENTAL OR ANCILLARY TO THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MANOR HOUSE SCHOOL
MANOR HOUSE LANE
BOOKHAM
LEATHERHEAD
KT23 4EN
- Phone:
- 01372458538
- Email:
- admin@manorhouseschool.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window