ST IVES (HASLEMERE) LIMITED

Charity Number: 312080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of a Nursery, Pre-Prep and Preparatory School for girls aged two to 11 and boys aged two to 5

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 27 February 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire
  • Surrey
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ST IVES SCHOOL (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
FIONA JANE BOULTON Trustee 13 March 2014
THE NORTH LONDON COLLEGIATE SCHOOL
Received: On time
Iain Geoffry Hazell Trustee 13 March 2014
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/02/2020 27/02/2021 27/02/2022 27/02/2023 27/02/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 February 2024 21 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 27 February 2023 15 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 27 February 2022 21 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 27 February 2021 23 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 27 February 2020 13 January 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Ives (Haslemere) Ltd
Three Gates Lane
Haslemere
GU27 2ES
Phone:
01428643734