BOX HILL SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Box Hill School is an independent school in an international network. We are a member of Round Square and exist to teach boys and girls from many countries in accordance with Kurt Hahn's principles particularly relevant to today's society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£10,566,230
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £10.57m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£10,969,267
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £10.63m | |
Other | £341.41k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £341.41k | |
Charitable expenditure | £10.63m |
People

131 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 4 |
£130k to £140k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 29 March 1966: Standard registration
- BOX HILL SCHOOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor JOHNSON | Chair | 22 February 2016 |
|
|||||
Patricia Keeling | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Whitby | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Bilby | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Calvin Man | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Horden | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Savage | Trustee | 12 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Gomes | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Townsend | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Jane R Agace | Trustee | 30 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ANGUS EVANS | Trustee | 30 June 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.44m | £9.48m | £8.87m | £9.86m | £10.57m | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.92m | £9.62m | £8.86m | £10.12m | £10.97m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £209.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £64.03k | £211.47k | £119.80k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £148.78k | £690.49k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £10.38m | £9.26m | £8.41m | £9.17m | £10.57m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.43k | £368 | £53 | £37 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £4.55k | £190.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £9.92m | £9.41m | £8.72m | £9.94m | £10.63m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £68.28k | £86.45k | £78.85k | £94.91k | £123.26k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £203.04k | £140.68k | £179.91k | £341.41k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £15.15m | £15.09m | £14.31m | £14.03m | £14.05m | |
|
Long-term investments | £100 | £100 | £100 | £100 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £4.29m | £3.61m | £4.45m | £1.77m | £1.32m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £11.79m | £11.20m | £11.25m | £8.54m | £8.52m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 18 June 2020 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 18 June 2020 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/08/1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/11/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/11/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24/11/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE TRUST IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC HAVING REGARD TO THE PRINCIPLES OF EDUCATION OF KURT HAHN AND IN CONNECTION WITH THAT OBJECT TO ACQUIRE, ESTABLISH, PROVIDE, CONDUCT AND CARRY ON RESIDENTIAL AND NON-RESIDENTIAL SCHOOLS IN WHICH BOYS AND GIRLS OF ALL SECTIONS OF THE COMMUNITY MAY RECEIVE A SOUND GENERAL EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 29 March 1966 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
BOX HILL SCHOOL
LONDON ROAD
MICKLEHAM
DORKING
RH5 6EA
- Phone:
- 01372385040
- Email:
- enquiries@boxhillschool.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window