RIPLEY COURT EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ripley Court provides a high quality education for its pupils. It has additional aims of providing scholarships and bursaries to children. Although most of its endeavours are aimed at the children who attend the school, the charity also attempts to aid the education of the children in the local area, by helping to provide facilities or expertise or by raising funds for local children's charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2019
Total income:
£3,460,098
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.46m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,590,859
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.59m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.59m |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 27 May 1969: Standard registration
- 11 May 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
- 11 May 2021: Funds transferred to 312008 THE LONDON ORPHAN ASYLUM (REED'S SCHOOL)
- RIPLEY COURT SCHOOL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/10/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.78m | £3.07m | £3.21m | £3.22m | £3.46m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.71m | £2.80m | £2.94m | £3.07m | £3.59m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £98.79k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £1.09k | £2.35k | £17.55k | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £26.70k | £65.87k | £73.19k | £77.50k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.75m | £3.00m | £3.13m | £3.14m | £3.46m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £948 | £820 | £306 | £231 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.70m | £2.80m | £2.94m | £3.07m | £3.59m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £11.39k | £9.06k | £9.24k | £11.29k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/10/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.56m | £3.47m | £3.43m | £3.48m | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.23m | £1.24m | £1.16m | £1.14m | £0 | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.21m | £1.86m | £1.46m | £1.34m | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 78 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 15 February 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 15 February 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 17 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | 17 April 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3RD AUGUST 1967, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION, PASSED 21ST MAY 1969. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION INCLUDING, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS IN OR NEAR RIPLEY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window