NEPTONS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make annual payments to a number of poor and needy in the London boroughs of Barking and Redbridge. To provide grants to students connected with the City of London. To provide grants to liverymen of the worshipful company of Poulters, their widows and dependants who are in need, hardship or distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

17 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- City Of London
Governance
- 10 October 1963: Standard registration
- THOMAS AND ANN NEPTON'S APPRENTICING CHARITY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susanne Wooltorton | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|||||||
Ivor Lee Cook | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|||||||
Benjamin Browning | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|||||||
JULIE GUBBINS | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
Stanley Liu | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
Terence Thurley | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|||||||
Paul Kelly | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
Mark Goodwin | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|||||||
Elizabeth Garner | Trustee | 18 March 2015 |
|
|||||||
JAMES THOMAS LAIDLAW CROSS | Trustee | 25 March 2014 |
|
|||||||
DAVID WILLIAM WALKER | Trustee | 31 October 2013 |
|
|||||||
Reginald Beer FRSA | Trustee | 31 October 2013 |
|
|||||||
ROBERT HENRY HAYNES | Trustee | 01 February 2013 |
|
|||||||
JOHN DOUGLAS HILTON BRIGGS | Trustee | 08 September 2011 |
|
|||||||
NICHOLAS RORY KEMP | Trustee |
|
||||||||
ROWLAND LLOYD HUGHES | Trustee |
|
||||||||
GEORGE HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.91k | £4.22k | £3.87k | £405.56k | £7.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.69k | £5.64k | £5.08k | £3.03k | £6.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 May 2024 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 May 2024 | 117 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 9 JUNE 1871 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 3RD FEBRUARY 1925 AND 7TH JUNE 1955 AND 7TH JANUARY 1985 AS AMENDED ON 11 JAN 2017 AS AMENDED ON 01 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY SHALL OUT OF THE YEARLY INCOME OF THE NEPTON CHARITY APPLY SUCH SUM AS THE COMPANY THINKS FIT, TAKING DUE ACCOUNT OF THE INCOME AVAILABLE TO THE CHARITY AND THE NEEDS OF THE BENEFICIARIES, IN RELIEVING IN CASES OF NEED PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF BARKING, IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARKING AND DAGENHAM, NEWHAM AND REDBRIDGE IN SUCH MANNER AS THE COMPANY THINKS FIT. SUBJECT TO THE PAYMENTS AFORESAID THE INCOME OF THE NEPTON CHARITY SHALL BE AVAILABLE FOR THE SUPPORT OF TWO CHARITABLE PURPOSES REFERRED TO HEREAFTER AS THE RELIEF IN NEED BRANCH AND THE ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE BRANCH, IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE COMPANY SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT. ANY AMOUNT OF INCOME NOT SPENT IN A FINANCIAL YEAR SHALL BE CARRIED FORWARD AND BE AVAILABLE FOR EXPENDITURE ON ANY OF THE CHARITY’S PURPOSES IN SUBSEQUENT YEARS. THE RELIEF IN NEED BRANCH SHALL BE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AND WHO ARE FREEMEN OR LIVERY MEN OF THE COMPANY OR WIDOWS OR OTHER DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS AS THE CASE MAY BE WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE PERSONS OTHERWISE QUALIFIED WHO ARE WIDOWS, IN EITHER OR BOTH OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS: I) IN PAYING PENSIONS TO PERSONS QUALIFIED AS AFORESAID IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS HEREINAFTER CONTAINED. II) IN MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO SUCH PERSONS OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THEIR NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS: PROVIDED THAT THE COMPANY MAY PAY FOR SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES BY WAY OF DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS TO INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS WHICH PROVIDE OR WHICH UNDERTAKE IN RETURN TO PROVIDE SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR SUCH PERSONS. THERE SHALL BE PAID TO EACH PENSIONER A PENSION AT A RATE DETERMINED BY THE COMPANY HAVING REGARD TO THE CIRCUMSTANCES OF THE PENSIONER AND THE INCOME AVAILABLE TO THE CHARITY: PROVIDED THAT INSTEAD OF PAYING THE WHOLE OF THE PENSION TO ANY PENSIONER IN MONEY THE COMPANY MAY EXPEND ALL OR PART THEREOF FOR HIS OR HER BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS IT THINKS FIT. THE ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE BRANCH SHALL BE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO ARE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS AND IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE OF THE FOLLOWING CLASSES AND IN THE FOLLOWING ORDER OF PRIORITY: (1) SONS OR DAUGHTERS OF FREEMEN OF THE CITY OF LONDON AND OF PERSONS RESIDING OR WORKING IN THE SAID CITY OF LONDON PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO PERSONS SO QUALIFIED WHO ARE SONS OR DAUGHTERS OF FREEMEN OF THE COMPANY; (2) PERSONS RESIDING OR WORKING IN OR ATTENDING EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN THE CITY OF LONDON; (3) SONS OR DAUGHTERS OF PERSONS WHO HAVE AT ANY TIME RESIDED OR WORKED IN THE CITY OF LONDON FOR AT LEAST FIVE YEARS, IN EITHER OR BOTH OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS: (A) IN ASSISTING SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE PREPARING FOR, ENTERING UPON OR ENGAGED IN ANY PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE, BY PROVIDING THEM WITH OUTFITS, OR BY PAYING THEIR FEES, TRAVELLING OR MAINTENANCE EXPENSES, OR BY OTHER MEANS FOR THEIR ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE TO ENABLE THEM TO EARN THEIR LIVING. (B) IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF SUCH PERSONS IN SUCH MANNER AS THE COMPANY THINKS FIT.
Area of benefit
THE CITY OF LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Bakery
15 Bull Lane
Ketton
Stamford
- Phone:
- 02084910354
- Email:
- POULTERSCLERK@LIVE.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window